MA H4270 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4340

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Webster be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Webster to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4340
2020-01-21JointHearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-12-26SenateSenate concurred
2019-12-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H4048 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4118
H4060 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
H4340 (Replaced by) 2020-09-24 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4993

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback