MA H4197 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4809

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Groton be authorized to grant two additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises and three additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Groton to grant additional alcoholic beverages licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4809
2020-06-01HouseRecommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2020-06-01HouseRules suspended
2020-02-24HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2019-12-12JointHearing scheduled for 12/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-11-18SenateSenate concurred
2019-11-14HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H4048 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4118
H4060 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
H4078 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4142
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4809 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback