MA S2381 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2188
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Easthampton to grant 8 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises, 4 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premise and 2 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk off the premises,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2381).
Title
Authorizing the city of Easthampton to grant 8 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises, 4 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premise and 1 additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-03-17 | House | Enacted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2020-01-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-01-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-10-24 | Senate | New draft of S2188 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2188 (Replaces) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2381
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H346 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H346 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2381 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2381.pdf |