MA H304 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-09 - Accompanied S105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for provisional licensure for speech-language pathologist or audiologist. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for provisional licensure for speech-language pathologists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09SenateAccompanied S105
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H309 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H203 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H205 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3949
H3053 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1179 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S162 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S105 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback