MA H203 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to licensure of equine dentists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to licensure of equine dentists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5043
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H205 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3949
H304 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - Accompanied S105
H1179 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S183 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S182 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S103 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S105 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1210 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S2448 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback