MA S103 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2682

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to nurse licensure compacts. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to nurse licensure compacts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2682
2020-02-18HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-05SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1961 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
S2682 (Replaced by) 2020-05-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback