MA S1210 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2448

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to dentistry licensure examinations. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dentistry licensure examinations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-30SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2448
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2448 (Replaced by) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback