MA S183 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2534

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the licensure of appraisers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the licensure of appraisers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2534
2019-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H1006 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3746 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback