MA H1116 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide health insurance coverage for certain medically necessary functional repair or restoration of craniofacial disorders. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ensuring treatment for genetic craniofacial conditions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13JointHearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1050 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H988 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1115 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H1036 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback