MA S613 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2935

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to insurance coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage for PANDAS/PANS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenateNew draft substituted, see S2935
2020-10-29SenateAmendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
2020-10-29SenateRead second
2020-10-29SenateRules suspended
2020-10-29SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2935
2020-06-25SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-06-25SenateReport amended by substitution of bill
2020-06-25SenateRules suspended
2020-06-25SenateOught NOT to pass (under JR10)
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-05-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S697 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2935 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback