MA S697 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a public health option. Health Care Financing.
Title
Establishing a public health option
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H1006 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3746 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H1006 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3746 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S697.pdf |