MA S2295 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H913

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SENATE, July 18, 2019 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill to increase consumer transparency about insurance provider networks (Senate, No. 610),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2295).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase consumer transparency about insurance provider networks

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-07-25 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #89 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31HouseAccompanied H913
2019-07-29HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-07-25SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #89 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0)
2019-07-25SenateRead third
2019-07-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-07-25SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S610
2019-07-18SenateRecommended new draft for S610
2019-07-18SenateReported from the committee on Senate ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
H3746 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Senate concurred
H913 (Replaced by) 2019-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4012
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback