MA S182 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the licensure of appraisers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the licensure of appraisers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1179 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S183 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S645 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S103 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S105 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H205 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3949
S1210 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
H203 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback