MA S645 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require licensed auto insurance damage appraisers to provide safety notices to the owners of damaged motor vehicles. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring licensed auto insurance damage appraisers to provide safety notices to the owners of damaged motor vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S183 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S182 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1033 (Similar To) 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H3555 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H355 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback