MA H3555 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring licensed auto insurance damage appraisers to provide safety notices to the owners of damaged motor vehicles. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring licensed auto insurance damage appraisers to provide safety notices to the owners of damaged motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1376 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S658 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S645 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1033 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1376 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S658 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S645 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1033 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3555 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3555.pdf |