MA H3821 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4402

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Sharon be authorized to grant four licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the town of Sharon to grant licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4402
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-03SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H698 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2019
S131 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H3826 (Similar To) 2019-12-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2019
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3870 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4693
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3993 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H4040 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H225 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4692
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
H4402 (Replaced by) 2020-05-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback