MA H3870 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Maynard be authorized to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on premise. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Maynard to grant additional alcoholic beverages licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4693 |
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H225 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4692
H4085 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2019
H4693 (Replaced by) 2020-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2020
H225 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4692
H4085 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2019
H4693 (Replaced by) 2020-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3870 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3870.pdf |