MA H698 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the nomination of candidates for town meeting in the town of Milford. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to nomination of candidates for town meeting in the town of Milford

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-29SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-08-26HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-06-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-06-27HouseRules suspended
2019-06-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-06-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-03-25JointHearing scheduled for 04/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H319 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3939
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3939 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2019
H3940 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3993 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback