MA H3848 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Hudson be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Hudson to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
2019-08-12SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-08-12HouseEnacted
2019-08-08SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2019-08-08SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-07-22SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-07-18HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-07-10HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-07-10HouseRules suspended
2019-07-10HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-07-08HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-06SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-03HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H698 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3870 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4693
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3993 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H4040 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H225 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4692
S131 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback