MA H292 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3795

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing the town of Dedham to convert a license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises to a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Dedham to convert a license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises to a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H3795
2019-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H294 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H295 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H3795 (Replaced by) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4140 (Similar To) 2020-10-01 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5023
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback