AZ HB2451 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-14 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-14 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; advertising; restrictions
Title
Marijuana; advertising; restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-10-0-0) |
2024-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Advertising
Civil Penalty
Effective Date
Enforcement
Exemption From Rulemaking
Marijuana
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Restrictions
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Three-fourths Vote
Civil Penalty
Effective Date
Enforcement
Exemption From Rulemaking
Marijuana
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Restrictions
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Three-fourths Vote