MA H4271 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5068

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Dedham be authorized to grant one additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Dedham to grant one additional license for the sale of beer and wine to be drunk on premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-22HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H5068
2020-10-05HouseRecommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2020-10-05HouseRules suspended
2020-02-24HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2020-01-21JointHearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-12-26SenateSenate concurred
2019-12-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H294 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H295 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H4140 (Similar To) 2020-10-01 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5023
H5068 (Replaced by) 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback