MA H3826 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to validating certain proceedings of the town of Sharon (House, No. 3826). May 30, 2019.
Title
Validating certain proceedings of the town of Sharon
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2019 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Enacted |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-10-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
S403 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3935 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S403 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3935 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3826 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3826.pdf |