MA H346 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the experience and background necessary to operate low pressure processed steam boilers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the experience and background necessary to operate low pressure processed steam boilers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5043
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H40 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4305
H234 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2142 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback