MA H3991 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Winchester be authorized to further regulate certain liquor licenses in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending certain liquor licenses in the town of Winchester

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2020-10-15HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-10-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-10-24HouseRules suspended
2019-10-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-10-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-07-29SenateSenate concurred
2019-07-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S128 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H361 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H343 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback