MA S186 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2212

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the granting of alcoholic beverages licenses not to be consumed on the premises by the town of Rockport. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the granting of alcoholic beverages licenses not to be consumed on the premises by the town of Rockport

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateNew draft substituted, see S2212
2019-05-02SenateRead second
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended
2019-05-02SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2019-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S128 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H361 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S22 (Similar To) 2020-12-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2970
H343 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2212 (Replaced by) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback