MA S128 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to authorizing temporary liquor licenses to benefit charities. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to authorizing temporary liquor licenses to benefit charities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2396 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H326 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S986 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2581 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H354 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H326 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S986 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2581 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H354 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S128 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S128.pdf |