MA H343 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the town of Palmer to issue three additional liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Palmer to issue additional liquor licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
S128 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H361 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S22 (Similar To) 2020-12-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2970
H3133 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
S128 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H361 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S22 (Similar To) 2020-12-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2970
H3133 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
S2261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H343 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H343.pdf |