MA H40 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4305

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 27) as relates to Keno licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Keno licenses

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4305
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H43 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H33 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H35 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5039
H47 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H39 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4300
H31 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H34 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H36 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4305 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback