MA H582 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a permanent commission on American Indian and Alaska Native education. Education.
Title
Providing for the creation of a permanent commission relative to the education of American Indian and Alaska Native residents of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4539 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H582.pdf |