MA S2541 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to healthy youth (being the text of Senate, No. 2534, printed as amended)
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-09-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #75 (Yeas 38 to Nays 1) |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Text of S2534, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S318 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S318 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2541 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2541.pdf |