MA H3226 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4910
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the promotion and celebration of the 250th anniversary of the American Revolution. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing a commission on the 250th anniversary of the American Revolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4910 |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4910 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3106 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4910 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3106 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3226 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3226.pdf |