MA S660 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to business interruption insurance. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to business interruption insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S787 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1221 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2401 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S628 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3100 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S661 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2587 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1191 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2487 (Similar To) 2021-11-11 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S710 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S709 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S634 (Similar To) 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1290 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Committee on conference appointed (Rodrigues-Friedman-O'Connor), in concurrence
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S671 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1202 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S658 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S629 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback