MA S658 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require prescription drug insurance providers to provide coverage for the expense of medically prescribed voice-synthesizers. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to prescription drug voice synthesizers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-29JointHearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1153 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1087 (Similar To) 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1068 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1208 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1290 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S803 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S672 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S732 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback