MA H4121 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4122

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton. September 22, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Order to safeguard the health of House Members and employees during the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-23 - House - House Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (Y: 131 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23HouseAdopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
2021-09-23HouseConsolidated amendment A adopted
2021-09-23HouseRules suspended
2021-09-23HouseConsolidated amendment A pending
2021-09-22HousePostponed until Thursday, September 23, 2021, at 1:00pm
2021-09-22HouseOrder adopted, see H4122
2021-09-22HouseCommittee recommended ought to be adopted
2021-09-22HouseReported from the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4122 (Replaced by) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
S2401 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1621 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1897 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
H139 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1194 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2021 from 10:30 AM-02:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H494 (Similar To) 2021-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback