MA S629 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to cognitive rehabilitation. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving lives by ensuring access to brain injury treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1078 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S787 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1221 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H3100 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S661 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S710 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S709 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S671 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback