CA AB3057 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21080.17 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: junior accessory dwelling units ordinances.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB3057 Wilson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 3057 Wilson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 3057 Wilson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5041.). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HOUSING. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5091.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.) |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |