AZ HB2242 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Willoughby to discharge the Conference Committee for HB2242 and Concur with the Senate amendment. Failed by sv 22-36
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Willoughby to discharge the Conference Committee for HB2242 and Concur with the Senate amendment. Failed by sv 22-36
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual conduct; minor; classification; sentence
Title
Sexual conduct; minor; classification; sentence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Willoughby to discharge the Conference Committee for HB2242 and Concur with the Senate amendment. Failed by sv 22-36 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Willoughby to discharge the Conference Committee for HB2242 and Concur with the Senate amendment. Failed by sv 22-36 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2024-04-11 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Conference Committee amendments to the House engrossed measure. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference members: ROGERS has been replaced by GOWAN HERNANDEZ has been replaced by FERNANDEZ |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference members: KERN, FERNANDEZ, GOWAN |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference members: WILLOUGHBY, KOLODIN, ORTIZ |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference appointed |
2024-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-8-3-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-17-1-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Classification
Criminal Code - Title 13
Defenses
Minors
Sentence
Sexual Conduct
Sexual Conduct With A Minor (s)
Sexual Offenses (s)
Criminal Code - Title 13
Defenses
Minors
Sentence
Sexual Conduct
Sexual Conduct With A Minor (s)
Sexual Offenses (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 1407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |