MA S787 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a public health option. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a public health option

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14JointHearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H1221 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H3100 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S661 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S710 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S709 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S671 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback