CA SB308 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - July 10 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - July 10 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 39742) to Chapter 4.3 of Part 2 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Carbon Dioxide Removal Market Development Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB308 Becker (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Assembly | July 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 1290.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1164.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 793.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39742 | New Code | See Bill Text |