MA H90 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House bill No. 89, as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. March 11, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financing a program for improvements to the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund and providing relief to employers and workers in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #25 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseFor actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
2021-04-20HouseFor message, see H3703
2021-04-01SenateSigned (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2021
2021-04-01 Governor returned to the House with amendments to sections 13 to 17, inclusive; and also to sections 22 and 29, and signed the remainder of the bill
2021-03-25SenateLaid before the Governor
2021-03-25SenateEnacted -see Roll Call #26 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0)
2021-03-25HouseEnacted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 17 )
2021-03-22HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, see text of H95
2021-03-22SenateSenate concurred in the further House amendment
2021-03-22SenateRules suspended
2021-03-22SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-03-22HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-03-18SenateReprinted as amended, see S38
2021-03-18SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #25 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0)
2021-03-18SenateRead third
2021-03-18SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-18SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S35, as amended
2021-03-17SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S35
2021-03-15SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2021
2021-03-15SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2021-03-18SenateRead second
2021-03-15SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-03-11HousePassed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 12 )
2021-03-11HouseH89, published as amended

Same As/Similar To

H89 (Replaces) 2021-03-11 - Published as amended, see H90
S38 (Replaces) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H3703 (Replaced by) 2021-04-20 - See H90
H3702 (Replaced by) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback