MA H3702 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sections 13 to 17, inclusive, and also sections 22 and 29 contained in the engrossed Bill financing a program for improvements to the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund and providing relief to employers and workers in the Commonwealth (see House, No. 90, amended), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see House, No. 3703). April 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for Massachusetts COVID-19 emergency paid sick leave

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Question on concurring in the House Amendment Roll Call #29 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Governor 's amendment rejected - 0 YEAS to 158 NAYS (Y: 0 N: 158 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - House Amendment adopted (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
2021-05-20SenateRe-enacted and again laid before the Governor
2021-05-20HouseRe-enacted
2021-05-20SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-05-20HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-05-20SenateHouse amendment adopted, in concurrence -see Roll Call #29 (Yeas 40 - Nays 0)
2021-05-20SenateAmendment #3 (Tarr) rejected
2021-05-20SenateAmendment #2 (DiZoglio) rejected
2021-05-20SenateAmendment #1 (DiZoglio) laid aside on a point of order
2021-05-20SenateGovernor's amendment rejected
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended
2021-05-18HouseAmendment adopted (see text of House document numbered 3771) - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 35 )
2021-05-18HouseGovernor 's amendment rejected - 0 YEAS to 158 NAYS ( See YEA and NAY No. 34 )
2021-05-18HouseBills in the Third Reading special report accepted
2021-04-20HouseReferred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
2021-04-20HouseFor message, see H3703
2021-04-20HouseEnacted as sections 13 to 17, inclusive; and also sections 22 and 29, see H90

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Replaced by) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
H3703 (Replaced by) 2021-04-20 - See H90
H3771 (Replaced by) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3865 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback