MA S709 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish minimum reimbursement rates to insurance claimants. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish minimum reimbursement rates to insurance claimants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-24JointHearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
H2023 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S355 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1573 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1930 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2089 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S505 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback