CA AB544 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 2750) to Division 2 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting pilot program: county jails.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 544 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2024-06-03SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2024-05-01SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB S.
2024-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 14. Page 3954.)
2024-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 18).
2024-01-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2023-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2023-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2023-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2023-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code2750New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback