CA AB884 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2103, 2158, 2300, 2406, 2408, 3019, 4005, 9054, 12303, 13107, 13209, 13211.7, 13307, 14105.3, 14111, 14200, 14219, and 19101 of, to amend and repeal Section 13400 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 14201 of, and to add Section 2601 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: language accessibility.
Sponsors
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Stephanie Nguyen [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 884 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 884 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3948.) |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 12303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13211.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14105.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14201 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |