CA AB2186 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23109.2 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: impoundment.
Sponsors
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2186 Vince Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2186 Vince Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB S. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23109.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |