NC H385 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of Battery-Charged Security Fences
Title
Regulation of Battery-Charged Security Fences
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Patricia Cotham [R] | Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Grey Mills [R] | Rep. Ray Pickett [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alarm Systems
Counties
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
Notification
Public
Safety
Safety Equipment
Counties
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
Notification
Public
Safety
Safety Equipment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 134.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 194.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |