DC B25-0229 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 25-229 would provide cost-free coverage of one prostate-specific antigen test and digital rectal exam per year. It would also prohibit any health insurer from imposing a deductible, coinsurance, copayment, or other cost-sharing requirement for prostate cancer screening.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cost-Free Coverage for Prostate Cancer Screening Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-28CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-08-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-07-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-04-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0229 Published in the DC Register
2023-04-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2023-03-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback