CA SCA1 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 15 and 17 of Article II thereof, and by amending Section 10 of Article V thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: recall of state officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Steve Bennett [D] | Sen. Catherine Blakespear [D] |
Sen. Caroline Menjivar [D] | Asm. Gail Pellerin [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCA1 Newman et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SCA 1 Newman Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA1 Newman et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SCA 1 Newman Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA1 Newman et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 3071.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2275.) (September 1). |
2023-08-29 | Senate | Set for hearing September 1. |
2023-08-28 | Senate | August 28 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1025.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |