MA S2401 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide COVID-19 emergency financial relief for veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing COVID-19 emergency financial relief for veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-13JointHearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2112 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2419 (Similar To) 2021-12-28 - Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2022 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1770 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2203 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2398 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2921 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2412 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2408 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1897 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S250 (Similar To) 2021-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2289 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1672 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2421 (Similar To) 2021-12-28 - Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2022 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S906 (Similar To) 2021-09-01 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback